judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

YVONNE D. HENDERSON V. EDWARD C. MAZIQUE PARENT & CHILD CNTR

Case Information: 11-AA-0206
Short Caption:YVONNE D. HENDERSON V. EDWARD C. MAZIQUE PARENT & CHILD CNTRClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02423-10Filed Date:02/24/2011

Opening Event Date:02/24/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/19/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/23/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerYvonne D. Henderson NPro SeN
RespondentEdward C. Mazique Parent & Child CenterN
Charles A. Ray, Jr.NY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/24/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
02/24/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
02/25/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
03/08/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (JAC)
04/14/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 8, 2011, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
05/11/2011APPEARANCE - of Charles A. Ray, Jr. as counsel for the respondent
08/19/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/transcript
08/19/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/29/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/26/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief and appendix
11/29/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
11/29/2011FiledDismissed
12/23/2011FiledMandate