judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JANET K. EVANS v. MICHAEL SCOTT JEFFRESS, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Dillard Ronald Jeffress, Deceased

Case Heading (S-09-0233)
Case Number:S-09-0233Case Docketed On:11/05/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:JANET K. EVANS v. MICHAEL SCOTT JEFFRESS, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Dillard Ronald Jeffress, Deceased
Full Title:JANET K. EVANS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. MICHAEL SCOTT JEFFRESS, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Dillard Ronald Jeffress, Deceased, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJanet K. EvansRex O. Arney
Eric Keimond Nelson
AppelleeMichael Scott JeffressRebecca Lynn Winkler
Randall T. Cox

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/05/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/05/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/05/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/06/2009Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
11/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion of Defendant/Appellee to Dismiss Pursuant to W.R.C.P. 54(b)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/24/2009Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
12/10/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal