Case Information: 32753 | |||
Short Caption: | LOWE VS. OLIVERO C/W 32485 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 32485 *, 32753 | Related Case(s): | 32485 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A360960 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 07/30/1998 / Crockett, James | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 01/11/2000 at 1:30 PM | Oral Argument Location: | Las Vegas Office |
Submission Date: | 01/11/2000 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/27/1998 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 (Robert A. Nersesian--check no. 4910). Additional $100.00 due. | ||
07/27/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | ||
07/29/1998 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Notice to Pay additional $100.00 Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days. | ||
07/30/1998 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: James R. Crockett, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
08/05/1998 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Robert A. Nersesian--check no. 4939. | ||
09/16/1998 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | ||
09/30/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file the docketing statement or risk the imposition of sanctions. | ||
10/12/1998 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | ||
10/21/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request and shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | ||
11/02/1998 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | ||
02/23/1999 | Brief | Filed Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 2/18/99). | ||
02/23/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appellant's Appendix. (Mailed on: 2/18/99). | ||
03/08/1999 | Brief | Filed Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 3/5/99). | ||
04/08/1999 | Brief | Filed Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 4/6/99). | ||
04/15/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Consolidating Appeals. These matters involve the same parties and the same district court proceeding. We elect to consolidate these matters for all appellate purposes. Nos. 32485, 32753. | ||
12/03/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 11, 2000 at the hour of 1:30 p.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas.(SNP99B-WM, MS, NB) | ||
12/27/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | ||
01/11/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Oral Argument before the Southern Nevada Panel: submitted. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 32485, 32753. | ||
03/24/2000 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part and remanded." Before Maupin, Shearing and Becker, JJ. By the Court, Maupin, J. We concur: Shearing, J. and Becker, J. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 43. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 32485, 32753 | 01-04909 | |
04/19/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-06229 | |
04/19/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/07/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 26, 2000. (Nos. 32485 and 32753) | 00-06229 |