judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NOWELL (BRIAN) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38372
Short Caption:NOWELL (BRIAN) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33857 , 38023 , 40436 , 40772
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C123771
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C123888
Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2001Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petitioner's Petition for Peremptory Writ of Mandamus Pursuant to NRS 34 and NRAP 21. 01-14334
09/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from the district attorney: 30 days from the date of this order to respond and show cause why a writ should not issue. 01-15431
10/15/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-17393
11/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-19182
11/16/2001WritIssued Writ. Certified copy of writ and order mailed to Hon. John S. McGroarty, District Judge, by this office. 01-19207
11/16/2001WritFiled Writ. Served on Hon. John S. McGroarty, District Judge, by mail from this office on this day. 01-19207
12/13/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-19510
12/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.