judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LARRY R. TAYLOR V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CT-0244
Short Caption:LARRY R. TAYLOR V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF4635-09Filed Date:02/26/2011

Opening Event Date:02/26/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:02/06/2012
Argued/Submitted:06/06/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/22/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLarry R. Taylor YPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY
Janice Y. SheppardYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/26/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Dennis Hart, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/09/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Dennis Hart, Esquire
04/07/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
06/03/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (509pgs/Hunt) 1/24-26/11 proc. w/CD
06/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/09/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/17/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (order-Judge Canan filed 1/12/11) *****SEALED*****
06/17/2011RECORD INDEX
06/17/2011RECORD COPIES
07/13/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) until August 18, 2011
07/29/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's moton for an extension of time to file the brief until August 18, 2011.
08/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/18/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
10/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
11/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/01/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until December 12, 2011
12/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until December 23, 2011 (Appellee)Granted
12/20/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until December 23, 2011
12/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/20/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to January 24, 2012. Brief (Appellee)Granted
02/06/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motions for extensions of time to file the brief and the lodged brief
02/06/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/06/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
04/05/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
06/06/2012FiledArgued before Judges Thompson, Beckwith, Reid Dennis M. Hart, Esq. for appellant Janice Y. Sheppard, Esq. for appellee
08/16/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Thompson and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
08/30/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
10/16/2012FiledOrdered that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
10/25/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File response to petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee)Granted
11/08/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time file appellee's response to appellant's petition to 12/14/12.
12/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee)Granted
12/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file a response and the Clerk shall file the lodged appellee's response to a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
12/26/2012FiledOpposition to petitoner for rehearing or rehearing en banc (Appellee)
03/11/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petiton for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
03/22/2013FiledMandate
04/05/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)