judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITE VS. UNBELIEVABLE INC. C/W 32017

Case Information: 31591
Short Caption:WHITE VS. UNBELIEVABLE INC. C/W 32017Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:31591*, 32017 Related Case(s): 32017
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A321426Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/31/1997 / Nitz, JohnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/10/2000 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/10/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/26/1997Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Harrison Kemp & Jones - check no. 011519.
12/26/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
12/30/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. (Judgment filed 11/14/97) to Clark County Clerk. Due Date: 10 days
12/31/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: John D. Nitz. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/08/1998Other Other. Received certified copy of final judgment on jury verdict. Filed in the district court November 14, 1997.
01/12/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
02/09/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.
02/13/1998Other Other. Mailed additional Notice of Appeal Documents to Settlement Judge John Nitz.
04/17/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
05/07/1998MotionFiled Motion. Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate (nos. 31591 & 32017).
06/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these appeals. On May 7, 1998, appellant filed a motion to consolidate these appeals. We grant the motion and consolidate these matters for all appellate purposes. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 31591, 32017.
06/18/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporters: Mary Beth Cook and Margie Carlson. Nos. 31591, 32017.
06/24/1998Other Other. Filed Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. Nos. 31591 and 32017.
07/31/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 24, 1997; October 27, 1997; October 28, 1997; October 29, 1997; October 30, 1997; October 31, 1997. Court Reporters: Lisa Makowski; Mary Beth Cook. Nos. 31591, 32017 (in 31591).
10/05/1998MotionFiled Stipulation. For extension of time to file appellant's opening brief and joint appendix (nos. 31591 and 32017).
10/06/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Stipulation filed October 5, 1998, is approved. The appellant's opening brief and joint appendix shall be served and filed on or before October 23, 1998. Nos. 31591, 32017.
10/26/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 10/23/98) (Nos. 31591 and 32017).
10/26/1998AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. (Nos. 31591 and 32017).
11/23/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent may have to and including December 9, 1998, within which to file the answering brief. (Nos. 31591, 32017.)
12/09/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. To file Respondent's brief. (Nos. 31591 and 32107).
12/11/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed December 9, 1998, is granted. The Respondent's answering brief shall be served and filed on or before January 8, 1999. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/08/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. To file Respondent's brief (nos. 31591, 32017).
01/11/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Motion and Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of J. Alan Warfield pursuant to Nevada Supreme court Rules, rule 42; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Cory M. Jones and J. Alan Warfield. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/11/1999Other Other. Filed consent to Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Alan Warfield. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/11/1999Other Other. Filed Verified Application for Association of Counsel under Nevada State Supreme Court Rule 42. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/11/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Motion and Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Roy G. Weatherup pursuant to Nevada Supreme court Rules, rule 42; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Roy G. Weatherup. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/11/1999Other Other. Filed consent to Admission Pro Hac Vice of Roy G. Weatherup. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/11/1999Other Other. Filed Verified Application for Association of Counsel under Nevada State Supreme Court Rule 42. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/11/1999Other Other. Filed Certificate of Mailing. Nos. 31591,32017.
01/13/1999Other Other. Mailed letter to Cohen, Johnson, Day and Clayson regarding service on State Bar and increase of fees - CC: all counsel and State Bar (nos. 31591, 32017).
01/14/1999Other Other. Filed opposition to Respondent's Motion for Extension to File Brief (nos. 31591, 32017).
02/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On January 8, 1999, Respondent filed a second motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Respondent shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 31591, 32017.
02/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. To file Respondent's brief (nos. 31591 and 32017).
02/16/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed February 5, 1999, is denied as moot. By order of the court dated February 4, 1999, Respondent's answering brief is due to be filed on or before March 8, 1999. Nos. 31591, 32017.
03/04/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. and copy of Supreme Court Rule 42 statement from the Law Offices of Cohen firm. Nos. 31591, 32017. Mailed on: UPS 3/3/99.
03/04/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering brief. (Brief signed by attorney Weatherup, foreign counsel-Compliance signed by Nevada counsel). Original brief in No. 31591. Nos. 31591, 32017. Mailed on: UPS 3/3/99.
03/15/1999Other Other. Filed Supreme Court Rule 42 statement for attorney J. Alan Warfield. Nos. 31591, 32017.
03/15/1999Other Other. Filed Supreme Court Rule 42 statement for attorney Roy G. Weatherup. Nos. 31591, 32017.
04/07/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 4/5/99) (Nos. 31591,32017)
04/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Attorneys Warfield and Weatherup shall be permitted to appear in this matter on behalf of respondent. Cory M. Jones, Esq., of the law firm of Cohen, Johnson, Day and Clayson shall be responsible for all matters presented herein by Respondent. Nos. 31591, 32017.
11/15/1999Other Other. Filed Notice of change of address for the law firm of Harrison, Kemp and Jones. Nos. 31591, 32017.
11/29/1999Other Other. Filed Notice of change of address for the law firm of Harrison, Kemp and Jones. (changed on the docket sheet 11/15/99). Nos. 31591, 32017.
12/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 10, 2000, at the hour of 1:30 p.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas. (SNP99B-WM, MS, NB).
12/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/10/2000Other Other. Oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel: submitted. SNP99B - WM/MS/NB. Nos. 31591, 32017.
01/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER these consolidated appeals dismissed." SNP 99B-WM/MS/NB. (Nos. 31591 and 32017).
05/10/2000MotionFiled Motion. Nos. 31591 and 32017 00-07776
05/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $250.00.(Nos. 31591 and 32017) 00-08629
05/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 25, 2000. 00-08629