judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD WHITMORE V. CLINTON COBB

Case Information: 11-CV-0205
Short Caption:RONALD WHITMORE V. CLINTON COBBClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB27076-10Filed Date:02/24/2011

Opening Event Date:02/24/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/30/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/13/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/01/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/29/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald A. Whitmore NPro SeN
AppelleeClinton A. Cobb NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/24/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY of Writ of Restitution.
02/25/2011TMC - EMERGENCY motion for stay
02/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED as appellant has failed to meet the standard necessary for entry of a stay. Barry v. Washington Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987). It is *****MORE*****
02/28/2011 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (GLFITE) (rm)
03/01/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 10/29/10 & 12/13/10) (elp)
03/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (9-pgs/tape 10/29/10)
03/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (39-pgs/tape 12/13/10 proc.)w/cd
03/30/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/01/2011RECORD INDEX
04/04/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY- or to vacate a writ of restituition ****CONSTRUED AS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION LW
04/12/2011TMC - appellant's motion for stay CONSTRUED as a motion for reconsideration
04/14/2011On ocnsideration of apellant's motion for stay, which the court construes as a motion for reconsideration of thie court's February 28, 201, order denying appellant's motion for stay, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion for reconsdieration is denied. (GLFITE)
05/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF
06/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before June 29, 2011. (JAC) elp
06/29/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo).
07/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF AND APPENDIX
08/01/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File and Expand Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/17/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File and Expand Brief (Appellant)
08/17/2011FiledBrief (Appellant) & appendix
09/14/2011FiledOrder directing appellee to file the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave within 15 days
10/13/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte scheduling this appeal before a merits division of this court.
10/13/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/01/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Beckwith, Farrell
03/07/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
03/29/2012FiledMandate