judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS (TY) VS. STATE C/W 38289

Case Information: 38349
Short Caption:THOMAS (TY) VS. STATE C/W 38289Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 38289 *, 38349
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010612Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/21/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-14131
08/23/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 8, 2001. Court Reporter: I. Zihn. Filed in district court on: August 13, 2001. 01-14354
08/23/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 21, 2001 (2). Court Reporter: I. Zihn. Filed in district court on: August 16, 2001. 01-14356
08/30/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 38289/38349 (01-14706). 01-14707
09/13/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/8/01, 5/21 to 5/24/01, and 7/20/01. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 01-15531
09/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. The stipulation filed August 30, 2001, is approved and these appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve a fast track statement and appendix on or beofre October 1, 2001. Nos. 38289/38349. (01-15989)
09/24/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 8, 2001. Nos. 38289/38349. (01-16106)
10/10/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Fast Track Statement in Excess of Ten Pages. Nos. 38289/38349. (01-17074)
10/10/2001Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. Nos. 38289/38349. (01-17075)
10/10/2001AppendixReceived Joint Appendix. Nos. 38289/38349. (01-17076)
10/30/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages, filed October 10, 2001. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on October 10, 2001. Nos. 38389/38349. (01-18194)
10/30/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Nos. 38289/38349.
10/30/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Nos. 38289/38349.
11/21/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Nos. 38289/38349. (01-19610)
11/21/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. Supplemental Joint Appendix. Nos. 38289/38349. (01-19611)
01/03/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. fn1[These cases have been consolidated by this court for appeal, pursuant to a stipulation of the parties.] "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 38289/38349 02-00161
01/29/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00656
01/29/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/06/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 1, 2002. 02-00656