judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAWRENCE FLOYD SILVA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0124)
Case Number:S-11-0124Case Docketed On:05/16/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:LAWRENCE FLOYD SILVA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LAWRENCE FLOYD SILVA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLawrence Floyd SilvaDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig
Andrew Jean Kuhlmann

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 37
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/16/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/01/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/12/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/15/2011Motion - To Allow Appellant to File Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Counsel's (Supplemental brief) No service of motion on either Public Defender or Attorney General. Proposed brief submitted.MotionOtherFinal
08/31/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/31/2011Order - Supplemental briefing - denyOrderSupplemental briefing - denyFinal
09/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/07/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/03/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice VoigtNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
10/03/2011Order - Assignment of judge - Marvin L. Tyler, District Judge, assigned to act in this matter for Justice Voigt.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Andrew Kuhlmann for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/10/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke, and District Judge Tyler (Eric Alden for appellant; Andrew Kuhlmann for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/10/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/12/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, District Judge Tyler writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/27/2012Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
03/27/2012Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
03/27/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Petition for Rehearing and Brief in Support of Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/10/2012Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
04/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/10/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/10/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/16/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/13/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal