judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TOMMY STATEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0222
Short Caption:TOMMY STATEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2188-10Filed Date:02/22/2011

Opening Event Date:02/22/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTommy Staten Y
Robert H. HollanderNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/22/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Robert Hollander, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/09/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Robert Hollander, Esquire
04/07/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) w/motion for appeal transcript attached (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (71pgs/Tape) 2/14/11 proc. w/CD
04/20/2011RECORD INDEX
04/20/2011RECORD COPIES
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (5pgs/Tape) 9/24/10 proc.
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (4pgs/Tape) 10/18/10 proc.
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (5pgs/Tape) 12/1/10 proc.
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (9pgs/Tape) 1/3/11 proc.
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (12pgs/Tape) 1/10/11 proc. w/CD attached
04/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/27/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL w/waiver attached
05/19/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See Johnson v. United States, 513 A.2d 798 (D.C. 1986). (By: ETW)
05/19/2011DISMISSED
06/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED