judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DALLAS RAILWAY AND TERMINAL COMPANY v. L. M. ROBERTS

Case: A-4474
A-4474
01/15/1954
Application for Writ of Error
DALLAS RAILWAY AND TERMINAL COMPANY
L. M. ROBERTS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/02/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/23/1954Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/16/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
01/15/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/02/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/23/1954Supplemental Brief filed
01/19/1954Letter Filed
01/16/1954Response to Petition
01/15/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/15/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dallas Railway and Terminal CompanyPetitioner
L. M. RobertsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information