judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ADRIAN E. ALEXANDER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0220
Short Caption:ADRIAN E. ALEXANDER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD17272-10Filed Date:02/22/2011

Opening Event Date:02/22/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/29/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/25/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/26/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAdrian E. Alexander Y
A. Kevin FaheyYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kenechukwu O. Okocha YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/22/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Kevin Fahey, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/09/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Kevin Fahey, Esquire
03/25/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (11pgs/Tape) 12/8/10 proc. (Morning)
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (141pgs/Tape) 12/8/10 proc. (Afternoon)
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (69pgs/Tape) 12/9/10 proc.
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (7pgs/Tape) 12/10/10 proc.
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (5pgs/Tape) 12/13/10 proc.
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (29pgs/Tape) 1/10/11 proc. w/CD
04/14/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/19/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/27/2011RECORD INDEX
04/27/2011RECORD COPIES
05/31/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 20 days (unopposed)
06/08/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 20, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 15 days
07/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief to the extent
07/18/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File (Appellant)
07/18/2011LodgedReceived - Brief (Appellant)
07/18/2011LodgedReceived - Appendix (Appellant)
07/29/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for leave to file the brief
07/29/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/29/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/29/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellant) **FILED AS APPELLEE'S BRIEF 11/29/11Denied
08/30/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
11/29/2011FiledORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE MOTION AS APPELLEE'S BRIEF...
11/29/2011FiledBrief - MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE FILED AS THE BRIEF (Appellee)
11/29/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/29/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/25/2012FiledSubmitted To Judges Wsahington,Thompson,Newman
09/28/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Thompson, Associate Jduge, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
10/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing En Banc for 60 days (Appellant)
10/04/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
10/19/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing en banc to December 18, 2012.
12/26/2012FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall isuue the mandate forthwith.
12/26/2012FiledMandate