judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRAD CARNAHAN and BRENDA CARNAHAN v. REX I. LEWIS and VICKIE R. LEWIS, as Trustees of the REX I. LEWIS LIVING TRUST and the VICKIE R. LEWIS LIVING TRUST

Case Heading (S-11-0122)
Case Number:S-11-0122Case Docketed On:05/12/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:BRAD CARNAHAN and BRENDA CARNAHAN v. REX I. LEWIS and VICKIE R. LEWIS, as Trustees of the REX I. LEWIS LIVING TRUST and the VICKIE R. LEWIS LIVING TRUST
Full Title:BRAD CARNAHAN and BRENDA CARNAHAN, Appellants (Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs), v. REX I. LEWIS and VICKIE R. LEWIS, as Trustees of the REX I. LEWIS LIVING TRUST and the VICKIE R. LEWIS LIVING TRUST, Appellees (Plaintiffs/Third-Party Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrad CarnahanKaren Budd Falen
Franklin J. Falen
Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
AppellantBrenda CarnahanKaren Budd Falen
Franklin J. Falen
Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
AppelleeRex I. LewisNicholas G. J. Healey
Timothy Lance Woznick
AppelleeVickie R. LewisNicholas G. J. Healey
Timothy Lance Woznick

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Jurisdiction - Appellate, Limitation of Actions, Planning and Zoning, Roads
Opinion Number:2012 WY 45
Citation:273 P.3d 1065 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/12/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/12/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/09/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/10/2011Motion - Accept misc. documents (Stipulation to Correct Record on Appeal)MotionAccept misc. documentsFinal
06/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/10/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Joint Stipulation to Correct Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Correction - Notice from Clerk of District Court that Record has been supplemented to include bench trial exhibits.Notice-IncomingCorrectionFinal
06/21/2011Order on Stipulated Request to Correct Record on AppealOrderOtherFinal
07/15/2011Brief - AppellantsBriefAppellantFinal
07/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellants; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/01/2011Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
09/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
09/08/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief - replyMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - motion for extension to file reply brief; and motion for withdrawal of counsel - Abigail Jones.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/09/2011Order - Allowing Withdrawal of counsel, Abigail M. JonesOrderOtherFinal
09/09/2011Order - Denying Appellants' Request for Extension to File Reply BriefOrderDenyFinal
09/19/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellants Brad and Brenda CarnahanEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Supplemental by Appellants)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/29/2011Event - Phone Call - Received phone call from Clerk of District Court. A designated transcript is missing from the record. They are trying to locate it and will transmit the record as soon as possible.EventPhone CallFinal
09/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Nicholas Healey for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/03/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kathryn Brack Morrow for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/09/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Karen Budd Falen and Kathryn Morrow, argument by Ms. Morrow for appellants; Nicholas G. J. Healey and Timothy L. Woznick, argument by Mr. Healey for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/09/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/27/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/12/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/12/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/17/2012Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2) - record signed for 04/16/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal