judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CROCKETT (THOMAS) VS. DEPT OF PRISONS

Case Information: 38348
Short Caption:CROCKETT (THOMAS) VS. DEPT OF PRISONSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38238
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C143422Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/21/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14129
09/20/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-15867
10/16/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-15967
10/16/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/09/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 25, 2001. 01-15967