judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTINA CLARK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0123)
Case Number:S-11-0123Case Docketed On:05/13/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CHRISTINA CLARK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTINA CLARK, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristina ClarkDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Matthias Lamar Sayer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea, Criminal Law -Probation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 61
Citation:275 P.3d 488 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/13/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/27/2011Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
06/27/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/27/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
06/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Se Brief and Brief of Appellant Pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/25/2011Order - Denying Permission for Court-Appointed Counsel to Withdraw and Order Requiring the Public Defender to File Merits BriefOrderDenyFinal
09/07/2011Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
09/07/2011Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
09/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion for partial remand for evidentiary hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel; affidavit of Christina Clark; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion to stay briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/27/2011Order - Denying Motion for Partial RemandOrderDenyFinal
10/27/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/14/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/30/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/30/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/12/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/19/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, but remanding for entry of an amended Judgment. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/07/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 5/8/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal