judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUHAIL VS. SUHAIL

Case Information: 31652
Short Caption:SUHAIL VS. SUHAILCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D195665Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/18/1998 / Lavelle, EleissaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/21/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
01/08/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
01/15/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: I.R. Ashleman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/21/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due date: 10 days.
01/23/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
01/26/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Video Transfer Services.
01/29/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200 (Edward G. Marshall--check no. 1932).
02/12/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. From settlement judge Ashleman. He is recusing himself from participation in this matter.
02/18/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Amended notice of Settlement Conference. New Settlement Judge: Eleissa Lavelle. (Settlement conference materials forwarded to Judge Lavelle.)
03/02/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. To prepare transcripts from: Theodora M. Law, Eighth Judicial District Court Family Division Transcript Video Services.
03/13/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified Copy of Reporter's Transcript dated: March 31, 1997 and July 28, 1997. Transcriber/Special Reporter: Linda M. Sisson.
04/02/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We deny as moot court reporter Theodora M. Law's motion for an extension of time to prepare the requested transcripts. The time deadline for preparing and filing transcripts was suspended pending conclusion of the settlement conference and order of this court.
08/20/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report: the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
09/08/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
11/17/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-ex 11/16/98).
11/17/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
12/18/1998MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondent shall have to and including January 19, 1999, to file the Answering Brief.
12/18/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address of Counsel for Appellant.
03/31/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Respondent shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, either file the answering brief or show cause why this court should not treat respondent's failure to file an answering brief as a confession of error.
04/23/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 4/21/99).
04/23/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Respondent's Answering Brief.
05/24/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 5/24/99).
12/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.
12/21/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the briefs to the Southern Nevada Panel this day. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
12/21/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. Maupin, J., dissenting: As noted by the majority, the district court properly shifted the burden of proof of dissolution of respondent's prior marriages to respondent. Respondent attempted to satisfy the shifted burden with hearsay evidence. Thus, respondent failed, in my view, to satisfy the shifted burden. Therefore, I would reverse for entry of a decree of annulment. 00-06777
05/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-08506
05/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 25, 2000. 00-08506