judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TRUE OIL COMPANY, LLC v. PENNANT SERVICE COMPANY, INC.

Case Heading (S-09-0235)
Case Number:S-09-0235Case Docketed On:11/05/2009
Linked To: S-09-0234
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:TRUE OIL COMPANY, LLC v. PENNANT SERVICE COMPANY, INC.
Full Title:TRUE OIL COMPANY, LLC, Appellant (Third-Party Plaintiff), v. PENNANT SERVICE COMPANY, INC., Appellee (Third-Party Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTrue Oil Company, LLCScott P. Klosterman
Patrick J. Murphy
AppelleePennant Service Company, Inc. a Colorado corporationRex O. Arney
Orintha Elizabeth Karns

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Contracts
Opinion Number:2011 WY 40
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/05/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/05/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/05/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/23/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
12/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Statement of Cost of Original TranscriptEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
02/09/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick J. Murphy for Appellee True Oil Company.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Orintha Karns for Pennant Service Company, Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/01/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/11/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Orintha E. Karns for appellant Pennant Service Company,Inc.; Scott P. Klosterman and Patrick Murphy for appellee True Oil Company, argument by Mr. Murphy for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/08/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Hill writing for the Court. Justice Burke filed a specially concurring/dissenting opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/23/2011Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
03/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
04/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/13/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/13/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/18/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/15/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal