judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MYERS (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34942
Short Caption:MYERS (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C139639Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/22/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09754
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34922, 34923, 34928, 34942, 34949, 34990, 35002, 35006. 99-11150
02/22/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 02/18/00. 00-02744
02/22/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/26/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR. 01-12703
08/21/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13025
08/21/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/30/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 27, 2001. 01-13025