judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDWARD A. KING and JANICE C. KING v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF FREMONT

Case Heading (S-09-0227)
Case Number:S-09-0227Case Docketed On:11/03/2009
Linked To: S-09-0228
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:EDWARD A. KING and JANICE C. KING v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF FREMONT
Full Title:EDWARD A. KING and JANICE C. KING, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF FREMONT, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEdward A. KingJason A. Neville
Keith J. Dodson
AppellantJanice C. KingJason A. Neville
Keith J. Dodson
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Fremont County, WyomingJodi A. Darrough

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Real, Roads
Opinion Number:2010 WY 154
Citation:244 P.3d 473

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/03/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
11/03/2009Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
11/03/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/05/2009Correspondence - Incoming from counsel for Hansen's North Fork re caption. Caption amended in both appeals.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/05/2009Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
12/21/2009Brief - Appellant in Case No. S-09-0228, with statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
12/21/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/22/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief of Appellants Edward A. King and Janice C. KingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/23/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants Edward A. King and Janice C. KingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppellantsNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
02/02/2010Notice-Internal - Other - Counsel for Hansen's North Fork removed as Appellee, inadvertently left on after caption revision.Notice-InternalOtherFinal
02/09/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/11/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee County CommissionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jodi Darraugh for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/22/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jason A. Neville and Keith J. Dodson for appellants King.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/01/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellants Edward A. King and Janice C. KingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/10/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Keith James Dodson, Jason A. Neville, Steven F. Freudenthal, argument by Messrs. Dodson and Freudenthal for appellants; Jodi A. Darrough, Deputy Fremont County Attorney for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/30/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court; Justice Burke filed a concurring in part, dissenting in part opinion in which Justice Voigt joined.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/15/2010Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
12/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants Edward A. King's and Janice C. King's Petition for Rehearing and Incorporated Brief in Support of Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/22/2010Response/Objection - OtherResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
12/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Response and Objection to Plaintiffs' Petitions for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
01/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/04/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/11/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/10/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal