judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEPHEN J. BECKER V. SHELITA PARHAM

Case Information: 11-FM-0203
Short Caption:STEPHEN J. BECKER V. SHELITA PARHAMClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO184-11Filed Date:02/17/2011

Opening Event Date:02/17/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/30/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/31/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/24/2012
Expedited

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStephen J. BeckerNPro SeN
AppelleeShelita Parham NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/17/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
03/09/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
03/15/2011 ON FURTHER CONSIDERATION of this court's 2/28/11 order...as prematurely filed since the motion...remained pending in the trial court, the response thereto, and it appearing that the motion was resolved...and the appeal has now ripened, it is ORDERED that the OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. It is *****MORE*****
03/15/2011 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (BY: ETW) LW
03/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 1/31/11 (rt. needed)
03/28/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (76 pgs/tape) 1/31/11 proc.
03/30/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/04/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
04/04/2011RECORD INDEX
04/27/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/27/2011APPENDIX
06/09/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant was filed with this court on April 27, 2011, and it further appearing that the brief of appellee was due to be filed on or before June 1, 2011, (See D.C. App. R. 31), but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC)
07/28/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte - schedule before merits division as soon as the calendar permits
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
09/27/2011FiledMotion To Expedite Appeal Hearing (Appellant)Granted
09/28/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO EXPEDITE
11/09/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Expedite Appeal and the CLERK SHALL PLACE THIS APPEAL ON THE JANUARY 2012 CALENDAR
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/08/2011FiledMotion for clarification) (Appellant)
12/16/2011FiledTMC//MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION
12/20/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion for clarification. (OBRZNK)
01/31/2012FiledSubmitted To Thompson,Easterly,Ferren
01/31/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
02/24/2012FiledMandate
05/02/2012LodgedSupplemental Record #2 (22-pgs/tape 3/22/12 proc.)w/cd