judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF RAUL BEJARANO GOMEZ, DECEASED, AN EMPLOYEE OF SUNDOWN, INC.: RAUL BEJARANO GOMEZ, DECEASED, BY AND THROUGH THE CONSULATE GENERAL OF PERU v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-09-0226)
Case Number:S-09-0226Case Docketed On:11/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF RAUL BEJARANO GOMEZ, DECEASED, AN EMPLOYEE OF SUNDOWN, INC.: RAUL BEJARANO GOMEZ, DECEASED, BY AND THROUGH THE CONSULATE GENERAL OF PERU v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF RAUL BEJARANO GOMEZ, DECEASED, AN EMPLOYEE OF SUNDOWN, INC.: RAUL BEJARANO GOMEZ, DECEASED, BY AND THROUGH THE CONSULATE GENERAL OF PERU, Appellant (Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantConsulate General of PeruWilliam G. Hibbler
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
James Michael Causey
Kristen Jocelyn Hanna
John William Renneisen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 67
Citation:231 P.3d 902

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/02/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
12/14/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in trial court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/29/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/02/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/17/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/24/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk; two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/30/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
05/25/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/26/2010Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
05/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Combined application and motion for payment of attorney's fees and costs, verification supporting same and notice of objection; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/28/2010Event - Phone Call - Received phone call from Mike Causey at AG, they have no objection to motion for fees & costs.EventPhone CallFinal
06/08/2010Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
06/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/28/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/28/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/01/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/30/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal