judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BINEGAR (MARK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38351
Short Caption:BINEGAR (MARK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C118933Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/10/2003How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/21/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14143
09/05/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14970
09/05/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-14971
12/20/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 16, 2002. 01-21511
01/18/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-01324
01/23/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed January 18, 2002. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by February 15, 2002. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-01492
02/19/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 35 pages. 02-03129
02/19/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 02/15/02. Signed by: David M. Schieck. 02-03157
02/19/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 02-03159
03/25/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 32 pages. 02-05218
03/25/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. Signed by: James Tufteland. 02-05219
03/25/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 02-05220
04/19/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 18, 2002. 02-06992
05/20/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 05/16/02. 02-08840
05/20/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/11/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Clark County Clerk regarding Transmission of Petiton for Writ of Habeas Corpus.
09/19/2002ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Certified copy of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Exhibits filed on December 7, 1998, in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. C118933. 02-16290
01/10/2003Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Panel: Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
03/17/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-04396
04/11/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-04616
04/11/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/28/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 14, 2003. 03-04616