judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF: ANDREW T. GRAVES, Deceased. BEIT HANINA ENTERPRISES, INC., a California corporation, by and through its Chief Executive Officer, Sharif Silmi v. J. DENNY MOFFETT, as personal representative of the Estate of Andrew T. Graves

Case Heading (S-11-0126)
Case Number:S-11-0126Case Docketed On:05/16/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF: ANDREW T. GRAVES, Deceased. BEIT HANINA ENTERPRISES, INC., a California corporation, by and through its Chief Executive Officer, Sharif Silmi v. J. DENNY MOFFETT, as personal representative of the Estate of Andrew T. Graves
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF: ANDREW T. GRAVES, Deceased. BEIT HANINA ENTERPRISES, INC., a California corporation, by and through its Chief Executive Officer, Sharif Silmi, Appellant (Claimant), v. J. DENNY MOFFETT, as personal representative of the Estate of Andrew T. Graves, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBeit Hanina Enterprises, Inc.Leonard Robert Carlman
AppelleeJ. Denny MoffettClay D. Geittmann

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Estates - Probate
Opinion Number:2011 WY 165
Citation:267 P.3d 1070

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/16/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/16/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/16/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant re Notice of AppealEventPhone CallFinal
05/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/24/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief for the AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/12/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/02/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/10/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II; Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/20/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/05/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/05/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/10/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal