judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AG CONTRACTING, LLC V. AMS BLUE SKIES, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0224
Short Caption:AG CONTRACTING, LLC V. AMS BLUE SKIES, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7563-10Filed Date:02/09/2011

Opening Event Date:02/09/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAg Contracting LLCN
Hilda DunkwuNN
AppelleeAngela Spriggs NPro SeN
AppelleeAdams National BankN
Joel S. AronsonNN
AppelleeAms Blue N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/03/2011RECORD INDEX
03/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (6-pgs/tape 1/7/11 proc.)w/cd
03/17/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this apepal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED since the case remains pending in the trial court... (BY: ETW)
03/17/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
04/05/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
04/26/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as PREMATURELY FILED but w/o prejudice to appellant filing a new appeal once all matters have been resolved... (THKNTE)
04/26/2011DISMISSED
05/18/2011MANDATE ISSUED