judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GUY HAMPTON v. CITY OF LARAMIE

Case Heading (S-11-0125)
Case Number:S-11-0125Case Docketed On:05/16/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:GUY HAMPTON v. CITY OF LARAMIE
Full Title:GUY HAMPTON, Petitioner, v. CITY OF LARAMIE, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerGuy HamptonR. Michael Vang
RespondentCity of Laramie, a Wyoming municipalityDavid Curtis Clark

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received (Hard copy delivered prior to e-filing 05/23/2011)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/16/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/16/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/16/2011Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
05/24/2011Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
05/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Peitionf or Writ of ReviewEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/25/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Petitioner, pages missing from Exhibit 8, will fax immediatelyEventPhone CallFinal
06/07/2011Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
06/07/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal