judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EMMANUEL T. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0223
Short Caption:EMMANUEL T. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD20496-10Filed Date:02/22/2011

Opening Event Date:02/22/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/21/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEmmanuel T. Williams Y
James E. DrewYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Mona A. Sahaf NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/22/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James Drew, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/09/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) James Drew, Esquire
04/14/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
04/14/2011RECEIVED- aplt's statement regarding transcripts
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (44pgs/Tape) 2/2/11 proc. w/CD
04/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/21/2011RECORD INDEX
04/21/2011RECORD COPIES
04/29/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
04/29/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
06/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until Juy 8, 2011 (no oppo)
06/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 8, 2011. (By: JAC)
07/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 7/15/11
07/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and filing the lodged brief
07/21/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/21/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
08/15/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/OPPO & MOTION FOR REVESRSAL
08/24/2011FiledOpposition to aple's motion for summary affirmance/MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL - (Appellant)
10/31/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Summary Affirmance and Denying cross-motion for reversal
10/31/2011FiledAffirmed
11/21/2011FiledMandate