judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ORRIS, SR. (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34935
Short Caption:ORRIS, SR. (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990067Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09700
10/14/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Stephen Young shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-09982
10/27/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for extension of time to comply with this court's order of October 14, 1999. 99-10539
11/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. The fast track statement shall be filed and served within 30 days of this order. 99-10815
11/08/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. May 10, 1999 and May 11, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Randi Lee Walker. 99-10986
11/22/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. May 10, 1999 and May 11, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Randi Lee Walker. 99-11633
12/06/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-12175
12/06/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw. 99-12176
12/06/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Documentation. 99-12177
12/14/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 11, 1999. Court Reporter: Randi Lee Walker. 99-12550
12/20/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 6, 1999, trial counsel filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. The motion is granted. Due Dates: Appoint counsel 30 days. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. From appointment: enter appearance 10 days; 15 days to file a supplemental fast track statement, if appellate counsel deems a supplemental fast track statement to be necessary. If a supplemental fast track statement is filed, the state shall have 10 days to file a supplemental fast track response. 99-12901
12/23/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-13115
03/23/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 6, 1999, this court granted trial counsel's motion to withdraw as counsel of record and remanded this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing appellate counsel for appellant. To date, counsel has not entered an appearance in this court. Due Dates: Appoint counsel 30 days. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. From appointment: enter appearance 10 days; 15 days to file a supplemental fast track statement, if appellate counsel deems a supplemental fast track statement to be necessary. If a supplemental fast track statement is filed, the state shall have 10 days to file a supplemental fast track response. 00-04647
04/21/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order appointing counsel filed in district court on January 19, 2000. 00-06431
04/25/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on January 19, 2000, appointing the Public Defender as counsel for appellant. 00-06654
05/04/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Washoe County Public Defender. 00-07290
05/04/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Court to Set Briefing Schedule. 00-07288
05/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On May 4, 2000, the Washoe County Public Defender entered an appearance in this appeal, and filed a motion for this court to set a briefing schedule. The motion is granted. Public Defender shall file a supplemental fast track statement within 15 days of this order if the Public Defender deems a supplemental fast track statement to be necessary. If a supplemental fast track statement is filed, the state shall have 10 days to file a supplemental fast track response. 00-08173
06/01/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Fast Track Statement. 00-09271
06/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The supplemental fast track statement shall be filed and served within 10 days of this order. 00-09461
06/19/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-10434
06/19/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-10435
06/27/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-10980
12/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part and Remanding in Part to Correct Judgment of Conviction. Having concluded that none of appellant's contentions warrant relief, " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction . . . we remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of entering a corrected judgment of conviction." Young, J. and Maupin, J. I dissent: Becker, J. SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-21419
01/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21538
01/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2001. 00-21538