judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD C. ANAMANYA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0193
Short Caption:RICHARD C. ANAMANYA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL4636-05Filed Date:02/14/2011

Opening Event Date:02/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/08/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard C. Anamanya Y
Sicilia C. EnglertYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Brandon S. Long YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/15/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sicilia Englert, Esquire
03/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 14, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, and it further appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sicilia Englert, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to Feburary 15, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
03/11/2011RECORD INDEX
03/11/2011RECORD COPIES
03/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for two weeks (no oppo)
05/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 16, 2011. (By: JAC)
05/09/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/appendix
05/09/2011APPENDIX
06/06/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD on appeal under seal w/attachments
06/06/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/attachments
06/06/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/06/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/16/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
07/25/2011FiledOrder Granting appellee's motions to supplement the record
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (Waiver of trial by jury or court upon entry of guilty plea Judge Satterfield filed 3/8/06; Court of Appeals MOJ filed 1/15/10)
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #2 (Presentence report filed 4/27/06) ****SEALED****
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/08/2011FiledSubmitted To Washington,Glickman,Reid
11/18/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and Reid, Associate Judge, Retired.)
12/12/2011FiledMandate