judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD WILLIAM DAWES, a/k/a RICHARD WILLIAM KEMP v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0211)
Case Number:S-09-0211Case Docketed On:10/21/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:RICHARD WILLIAM DAWES, a/k/a RICHARD WILLIAM KEMP v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD WILLIAM DAWES, a/k/a RICHARD WILLIAM KEMP, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard William DawesDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Jurisdiction, Venue
Opinion Number:2010 WY 113
Citation:236 P.3d 303 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/21/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/03/2009Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received copy of proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/04/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/07/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - appellant.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
02/19/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/12/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Jenny L. Craig, counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/13/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/13/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/06/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/24/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/26/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal