Case Information: 34934 | |||
Short Caption: | SPAMPINATO VS. MIER Y TERAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9900313 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/22/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/07/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Thomas Spampinato--check no. 131. | ||
10/07/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-09699 | |
10/25/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 99-10457 | |
11/22/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Mailed on 11/18/99. | 99-11610 | |
11/22/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/25/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Although appellant was not ranted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant]. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-01246 | |
02/23/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. | 00-02841 | |
02/23/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/09/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 28, 2000. | 00-02841 |