judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONALD ANDREW ROMERO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0210)
Case Number:S-09-0210Case Docketed On:10/21/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:RONALD ANDREW ROMERO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RONALD ANDREW ROMERO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald Andrew RomeroDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
John S. Burbridge

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 84
Citation:233 P.3d 951

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/21/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/07/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/07/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/20/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/25/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/01/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/09/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/12/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits; Volume V, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/30/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
06/24/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/09/2010Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
07/09/2010Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
07/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for rehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant in support of petition for rehearing.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/20/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
07/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/20/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/20/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/22/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/21/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme CourtNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
12/06/2010Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - petition for writ of certiorari denied.Notice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal