judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SYDNEY L. GROSS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CT-0192
Short Caption:SYDNEY L. GROSS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF10969-10Filed Date:02/15/2011

Opening Event Date:02/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/23/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/20/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/19/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSydney L. Gross YPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY
Janice Y. SheppardNY
Sarah Branch YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/15/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/02/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (By: JAC)
03/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/16/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS Granted
03/23/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of counsel for appellant to withdraw appearance is granted and the appearance of Roosevelt Brown, III, Esquire, is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Judith Lovelace, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for thsi appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: ETW)
03/23/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Judith Lovelace, Esquire
04/04/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of consel for appellant to withdraw appearance is granted and the appearance of Roosevelt Brown, III, Esquire, is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Judith Lovelace, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcrpt available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: ETW)
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (121pgs/Tape) 1/25/11 proc. w/CD
04/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/27/2011RECORD INDEX
04/27/2011RECORD COPIES
05/13/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 4, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
05/26/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo)
05/26/2011RECEIVED - statement regarding transcript
06/09/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
06/09/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
07/19/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/19/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/03/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to October 20, 2011 Appendix, Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until October 20, 2011
10/19/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee) ****FILED AS APPELLEE'S BRIEF 11/23/11
10/20/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/MOTION TO FILE (LODGED) OPPO
11/03/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant)Granted
11/23/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave and the Clerk SHALL FILE THE OPPOSITION and...
11/23/2011FiledOpposition - to aple's motion for summary affirmance (Appellant)
11/23/2011FiledORDER DENYING APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and the Clerk shall file the motion as APPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/23/2011FiledBrief - MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRAMANCE FILED AS THE BRIEF (Appellee)
11/23/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/20/2012FiledSubmitted To Glickman,Easterly,Belson
08/28/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
08/31/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
09/19/2012FiledMandate