judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM S. HANSULD and TIA J. HANSULD v. LARIAT DIESEL CORPORATION, and MARVIN PIEL

Case Heading (S-09-0206)
Case Number:S-09-0206Case Docketed On:10/15/2009
Linked To: S-09-0207
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Property
Short Title:WILLIAM S. HANSULD and TIA J. HANSULD v. LARIAT DIESEL CORPORATION, and MARVIN PIEL
Full Title:WILLIAM S. HANSULD and TIA J. HANSULD, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. LARIAT DIESEL CORPORATION, and MARVIN PIEL, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam S. HansuldLarry W. Harrington
AppellantTia J. HansuldLarry W. Harrington
AppelleeLariat Diesel CorporationThomas M. Hogan
AppelleeMarvin PielThomas M. Hogan

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2010 WY 160
Citation:245 P.3d 293

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/15/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/15/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/02/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants William and Tia HansuldEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/19/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
01/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the Appellees, Lariat Diesel Corporation and Marvin Piel; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' request for assignment to expedited docketEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/27/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/28/2010Notice-Internal - Veto of expedite recommendation.Notice-InternalVetoFinal
02/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/19/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/23/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
02/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas Hogan for Lariat Diesel Corporation and Piel.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - joint motion to vacate oral argument.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/25/2010Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Larry Harrington for Hansulds.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas Hogan for Lariat Diesel Corporation and Piel.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/25/2010Order - Oral argument - amending schedule - moved from 6/16 to 6/15/10.OrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
05/25/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
06/15/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Larry W. Harrington for appellant Hansuld; Thomas M. Hogan for appellee Lariet Diesel Corporation) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/15/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/09/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/28/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/28/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/30/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/29/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal