judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIE D. PAIGE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0188
Short Caption:WILLIE D. PAIGE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-26004-09Filed Date:02/15/2011

Opening Event Date:02/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWillie D. Paige Y
James W. KleinNY
Jonathan W. Anderson NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/15/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/02/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))\
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (93 pgs/Van Bremen) 11/23/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (241 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 11/29-30/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (8 pgs/tape) 2/3/11 proc. w/cd
05/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/10/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/18/2011RECORD INDEX
05/18/2011RECORD COPIES
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until September 19, 2011 (no oppo)
06/24/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 19, 2011. (Castillo)
09/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until December 19, 2011 (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief to 12/19/11
12/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/04/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file brief and limited appendix to 3/19/12.
02/13/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal w/waiver attached (Appellant)Granted
02/21/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal w/waiver attached (Appellant)
02/21/2012FiledDismissed
03/14/2012FiledMandate