judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JANE MORETZ-EDMISTEN V. BRUCE D. BURTOFF

Case Information: 08-CV-0487
Short Caption:JANE MORETZ-EDMISTEN V. BRUCE D. BURTOFFClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 08-CV-0485 Consolidated: 08-CV-0486 , 08-CV-0487
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB199-06Filed Date:04/30/2008

Opening Event Date:04/30/2008Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/28/2008Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/13/2008
Argued/Submitted:06/23/2009
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/20/2009

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJane Moretz-Edminsten N
Paul J. MaloneyYY
AppelleeBruce D. Burtoff NPro SeN
AppelleeStephen Cochran N
David N. Webster YN
Adam L. Van GrackNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/30/2008NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/14/2008 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that transcript is needed for these appeals, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 08-CV-485, 08-CV-486 and 08-CV-487 are consolidated for all purposes. It is (MORE)
05/14/2008 FURTHER ORDERED that each appellant/cross- appellee shall within 20 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants/cross-appellees must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellants/cross-appellees must file a statement of issues to be presented with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants/cross-appellees' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (GP) elp
05/20/2008APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- to court order 5/14/08 (STEPHEN G. COCHRAN) construed as an SRT to note that: (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 5/8/08) (elp)
05/20/2008APPEARANCE - of Adam L. Vangrack, Esquire and James P. Wehner, Esquire as counsel for appellee/cross-appellant (Cochran)
05/23/2008STATEMENT- from aplt cross aple re: transcripts (JANE EDMISTEN) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 5/8/07) (elp)
05/27/2008STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (BRUCE D. BURTOFF) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 10/5/07) (elp)
07/24/2008SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 90 pages/Rowe. (5/8/07 proc.)
07/28/2008SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (35 pgs. -- Noyes) (10/5/07 proc.)
07/28/2008RECORD COMPLETED
08/05/2008 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the briefs shall be filed as follows: Opening brief of appellant/cross-appellee, and the appendix, within 40 days from the date of this order; Responsive brief of appellee/cross-appellant, within 30 days from the date of service of the opening brief of appellant/cross- appellee; Consolidated Reply brief of appellant/cross- appellee, within 21 days from the date of service of the responsive brief of appellee/ cross-appellant; and Reply brief of each appellee/cross-appellant, if any, within 21 days from the date of service of the reply brief of appellant/cross-appellee. (GP) elp
09/15/2008APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF
09/15/2008APPENDIX- aplt cross aple
09/23/2008RECORD INDEX all
10/20/2008APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANTS' JOINT BRIEF (This is a joint brief of both cross-appellants)
11/05/2008APLT-X-APLE MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to supplement the appendix
11/12/2008APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION- to motion to supplement the appendix
11/13/2008APPELLANT-CROSS-APPELLEE REPLY BRIEF
11/13/2008BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/19/2008RECEIVED- aplt's cross aple supplement exhibits to the partially contested procedual motion to supplement the appedix (elp)
12/03/2008 On consideration of appellant/cross-appellee's partially contested motion to supplement the appendix, the opposition thereto, and appellant/cross-appellee's supplemental exhibts, and it appearing that briefing has been completed, it is ORDERED that appellant/cross-appellee's motion is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged exhibits as a supplement to the appendix. It is (MORE)
12/03/2008APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX
12/03/2008 FURTHER ORDERED that these appeals shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (ETW) elp
12/09/2008APPELLEE-CROSS-APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF (JOINT)
01/31/2009FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
04/03/2009 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month of June 2009, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by April 20, 2009 of specific dates during that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. Counsel must continue to advise the court of availabilities for subsequent months until this case is in fact set for argument. Note that the calendar is prepared approximately two months in advance, e.g. January calendar set for release at the end of November. The court does not encourage the filing of motions to postpone a scheduled argument. If you do seek a change in a scheduled argument date, your motion should both indicate the opponent's position with respect to your request and alternative dates when you and opposing counsel would be available. You may call the Calendar Clerk prior to filing such a motion for information on dates in the scheduled month when the courtroom is available.(aj) Garland Pinkston, Jr. Clerk
04/10/2009LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple cross aplt
04/20/2009LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple cross aplt
04/23/2009LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
05/07/2009CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/16/2009APPEARANCE - of Adam L. VanGrack counsel for aple/cross aplt
06/16/2009CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
06/23/2009FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/23/2009ARGUED before Judges Washington, Glickman, Pryor Bruce D.Burtoff, pro se. Paul J.Maloney Esq. for Ms. Edmisten David N.Webster Esq.,for Mr. Cochran William J.Carter Esq.,for Ms. Edmisten
07/28/2009AFFIRMED MOJ (Washington, Glickman, Pryor)
08/20/2009MANDATE ISSUED
08/26/2009CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Adam L. VanGrack Shulman, Rogers, Gandal, Pordy & Ecker, P.A. 12505 Park Potomac Ave., 6th Floor Potomac, MD 20854 301 230-5200