judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATTHEW ROBERT FRAZIER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0205)
Case Number:S-09-0205Case Docketed On:10/15/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MATTHEW ROBERT FRAZIER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MATTHEW ROBERT FRAZIER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMatthew Robert FrazierDion James Custis
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2010 WY 107
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/15/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/15/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/20/2009Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
11/24/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/03/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Dion Custis for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/24/2010Event - Phone Call - Received call from Trish at A.G.'s Office. She advised that this case will be argued by Paul Rehurek. Added Mr. Rehurek to case, no further action required.EventPhone CallFinal
03/16/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Dion James Custis for appellant; Paul Rehurek, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/30/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/17/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/17/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/20/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/19/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal