judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSHUA E. ROSS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0187
Short Caption:JOSHUA E. ROSS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL4799-04Filed Date:02/14/2011

Opening Event Date:02/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/06/2012
Argued/Submitted:11/20/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/04/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoshua E. Ross YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Anne Y. ParkYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/02/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Richard S. Stolker, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/02/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Richard S. Stolker, Esquire
04/05/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (171 pgs/Kaczorowski) 11/2-3/05 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (391 pgs/Allison) 11/9-10/05 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (413 pgs/Rogers) 11/7-8/05 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (145 pgs/Hunt) 11/14/05 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (151pgs/tape) 11/15-16/05 proc
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (23 pgs/tape) 1/6/06 proc. w/cd
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (CD of phone call-filed 12/15/05 in brown exh envelope)
08/17/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/17/2011FiledRecord Index
08/17/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/19/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 10/28/11.
11/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 11/28/11.
11/28/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/28/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 3/6/12.
03/06/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/06/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/16/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (17 pgs/tape) 10/27/05 proc.
03/16/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (20 pgs/tape) 10/31/05 proc. w/cd
03/20/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
04/06/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/20/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
04/23/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
07/09/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/14/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
11/16/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
11/20/2012FiledOrder Granting aple's motion to supplement the record.
11/20/2012FiledArgued Before Judges Glickman,Thompson,Oberly, Richard S.Stolker Esq.,for appellant, Anne Y.Park Esq.,for appellee.
12/12/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman, Thompson, and Oberly, Associate Judges.)
12/20/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
01/04/2013FiledMandate