judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FLORES (JOSE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33186
Short Caption:FLORES (JOSE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33570
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C147772Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/10/2000 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/10/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/16/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/16/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
10/22/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Mailed out corrected receipt to all counsel (Washoe D.A. not Clark CO. D.A.).
10/22/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson.
10/26/1998Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on October 20, 1998.
10/26/1998Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of Order appointing attorney Davied Schieck as counsel for appellant. Filed in district court on 10/14/98.
10/26/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
10/26/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to: (1) enter a written judgment of conviction or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. The clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court.
11/19/1998Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial) filed in the district court on October 20, 1998.
11/25/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified Copy of Transcript of Proceedings. 4/8/98; 4/23/98; 5/6/98; 7/13/98; 8/10/98; 10/8/98;. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson.
01/11/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Transcript of Proceedings: 05/18/98-05/22/98; 05/26/98-05/29/98; 05/19/98 Vol. II; 05/20/98 Vol. III; 05/21/98 Vol. IV; 05/22/98 Vol. V; 05/26/98 Vol. VI; 05/27/98 Vol. VII; 05/28/98 Vol. VIII; 05/29/98 Vol. IX; 06/01/98 Vol. X; 08/13/98; 09/03/98; 09/17/98; 09/24/98; 10/08/98. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson.
02/12/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant shall have to and including March 15, 1999 to file the Opening Brief.
03/15/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix.
03/16/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The Motion filed March 15, 1999, is granted. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before April 14, 1999.
04/16/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to allow Appellant to file an Opening Brief in Excess of 30 pages.
04/16/1999BriefReceived Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on 04/14/99).
04/16/1999AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Appendix, Vols. 1 through 6, and Index.
04/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We grant appellant's unopposed motion to file an opening brief in excess of 30 pages, to wit: 68 pages. The clerk shall file the opening brief submitted provisionally with the motion, forthwith.
04/29/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
04/29/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix, Vols. 1 through 6, and Index (index contained in each volume of appendix).
05/04/1999Other Other. Received phone call from Washoe County District Attorney's Office. Respondent is represented by the Clark County District Attorney (re-mailed 04/29/99 order to Clark County D.A.)
05/24/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondent's Answering Brief may be filed in excess of 30 pages. To-wit: 43 pages.
05/24/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief (mailed express mail).
06/21/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant may have to and including July 19, 1999, to file Appellant's Reply Brief.
07/21/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellant's Reply Brief. Mailed on 07/19/99.
07/23/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The Motion filed July 21, 1999, is granted. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to serve and file the reply brief.
07/28/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Appellant may file brief in excess of 30 pages to wit: 32 pages.
07/28/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 7/26/99).
12/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 10, 2000 at the hour of 11:30 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas. (SNP99B-WM, MS, NB).
12/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
08/21/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Maupin, Shearing and Becker, JJ. By the Court, Shearing, J. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No.77. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14588
09/18/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14757
09/18/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-14757