judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CROSS (RICKEY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34943
Short Caption:CROSS (RICKEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P1879Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-09774
11/05/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10914
11/05/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-10916
11/29/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response with attached Respondent's Supplemental Appendix. 99-11830
12/27/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-13209
01/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-01153
01/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/11/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 7, 2000. 00-01153