judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HANSEN'S NORTH FORK RANCH, LLLP v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF FREMONT

Case Heading (S-09-0228)
Case Number:S-09-0228Case Docketed On:11/03/2009
Linked To: S-09-0227
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:HANSEN'S NORTH FORK RANCH, LLLP v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF FREMONT
Full Title:HANSEN'S NORTH FORK RANCH, LLLP, Appellant (Intervening Plaintiff) v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF FREMONT, Appellee (Defendant),

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHansen's North Fork Ranch, LLLPSteven F. Freudenthal
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Fremont County, WyomingJodi A. Darrough

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Real, Roads
Opinion Number:2010 WY 154
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/03/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/03/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/05/2009Correspondence - Incoming from counsel for Hansen's North Fork re caption. Caption amended in both appeals.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
12/21/2009Brief - Appellant in Case No. S-09-0228, with statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
12/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
02/04/2010Brief - Appellee - Board of County Commissioners of the County of FremontBriefAppelleeFinal
02/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Board of County CommissionersEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2010Brief - Failure to file - appellee Edward and Janice KingBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jodi Darraugh for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Hansen's North Fork Ranch, LLLP Appellant (Intervening Plaintiff below)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jason A. Neville and Keith J. Dodson for appellants King.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Steve Freudenthal for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/01/2010Notice-Internal - Other - Corrected caption to reflect actual parties pursuant to Court's letter revising caption.Notice-InternalOtherFinal
03/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/10/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Keith James Dodson, Jason A. Neville, Steven F. Freudenthal, argument by Messrs. Dodson and Freudenthal for appellants; Jodi A. Darrough, Deputy Fremont County Attorney for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/30/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court; Justice Burke filed a concurring in part, dissenting in part opinion in which Justice Voigt joined.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/15/2010Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
12/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant North Fork Ranch, LLP's petition for rehearing and joinder in Appellants Kings' petition for rehearing and brief in support of petition for rehearing.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Response and Objection to Plaintiffs' Petitions for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
01/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/04/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/11/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/10/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal