judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MAURICE MINCHEN v. FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF ALPINE, ET AL.

Case: A-4492
A-4492
02/01/1954
Application for Writ of Error
MAURICE MINCHEN
FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF ALPINE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/29/1954Amended motion for rehearingPetitioner
04/19/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/03/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/11/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
02/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/29/1954Amended motion for rehearingOverruled
04/19/1954Motion for Rehearing
03/03/1954Reply to Response
02/11/1954Response to Petition
02/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/01/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Maurice MinchenPetitioner
First National Bank of Alpine, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information