judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION v. JACK D. VINEYARD

Case: A-4493
A-4493
02/03/1954
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
JACK D. VINEYARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/11/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/03/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/13/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
02/03/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/19/1954Response to Motion filed
03/11/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/03/1954Reply to Response
02/13/1954Response to Petition
02/03/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/03/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jack D. VineyardRespondent
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information