judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEPHEN P. CHEEK v. HAMSFORK INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company

Case Heading (S-09-0223)
Case Number:S-09-0223Case Docketed On:11/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:STEPHEN P. CHEEK v. HAMSFORK INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company
Full Title:STEPHEN P. CHEEK, Appellant (Defendant), v. HAMSFORK INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantStephen P. Cheek Pro Se
AppelleeHamsfork Investment Group, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability CompanyStephen Joseph Darrah

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/02/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/18/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/18/2009Correspondence - Outgoing to Appellant. Failed to send copies of brief.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Six copies of Appellant's Brief, original copy timely filed December 18, 2009.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/21/2010Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
01/21/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion to dismiss for failure to follow rules; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/25/2010Order - Grant - extension of time to file appellee's brief (date will be set upon ruling on motion to dismiss)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/09/2010Order - Dismiss - involuntary and Order Certifying No Reasonable Cause for AppealOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
02/23/2010Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
02/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion and Affidavit of S. Joseph Darrah in Support of Attorney Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/23/2010Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
03/23/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal