judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BARRY C. PHILIPS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0199
Short Caption:BARRY C. PHILIPS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD14038-09Filed Date:02/17/2011

Opening Event Date:02/17/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/30/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/17/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/09/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBarry C. Philips YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Andrea L. Hertzfeld YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/17/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/18/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Jeffrey Light, Esquire
03/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on Feburary 17, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, and it further appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Jeffrey Light, Esquire, is hereby appointe nunc pro tunc to February 18, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
03/11/2011RECORD INDEX
03/11/2011RECORD COPIES
03/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/25/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/ appendix attached
04/25/2011APPENDIX
05/31/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 30, 2011 (no oppo)
06/08/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 30, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/30/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/30/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/17/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, Oberly, Newman
11/18/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judges.)
12/09/2011FiledMandate
01/06/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)