judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALKER PATTERSON INMAN, JR. v. DAISHA LORAINE WILLIAMS, f/k/a DAISHA LORAINE INMAN

Case Heading (S-09-0222)
Case Number:S-09-0222Case Docketed On:11/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:WALKER PATTERSON INMAN, JR. v. DAISHA LORAINE WILLIAMS, f/k/a DAISHA LORAINE INMAN
Full Title:WALKER PATTERSON INMAN, JR., Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DAISHA LORAINE WILLIAMS, f/k/a DAISHA LORAINE INMAN, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWalker Patterson Inman Jr.John D. Bowers
Joshua Tyler Smith
AppelleeDaisha Loraine WilliamsWilliam L. Combs
Other Particpants
Guardian ad litemJean A. Day

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/02/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice KiteNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice Voigt.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
11/10/2009Order - Assignment of judge - Keith G. Kautz, District Judge, assigned to act in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/10/2009Order - Assignment of judge - John R. Perry, District Judge, assigned to act in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/10/2009Order - Assignment of judge - Jeffrey A. Donnell, District Judge, assigned to act in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/24/2009Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
12/10/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal