judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MAUREEN M. DASANT V. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL

Case Information: 11-AA-0184
Short Caption:MAUREEN M. DASANT V. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONALClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Lead:11-AA-0184Consolidated: 11-AA-0204
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02947-10Filed Date:02/22/2011

Opening Event Date:02/22/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/09/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMaureen Milliner Dasant NPro SeN
RespondentMarriott InternationalNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/22/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW-NPT PER 2/28/11 ORDER (PFR/IFP was filed with OAH instead of the DCCA on January 25, 2011. OAH sent the package over to us today. LW
02/22/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (Served by: DCCA on 2/22/11).
02/28/2011 ORDERED, SS, that APPEALS NOS 11AA184 and 11AA204 ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES. It is *****MORE*****
02/28/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for IFP IS GRANTED and th Clerk shall file the lodged PFR, NPT, TO FEBRUARY 22, 2011. It is ****MORE*****
02/28/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why these petitions should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
02/28/2011TMC - OTSC
04/04/2011 ORDERED that these PFRs ARE DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 15 (a)(2). (GLPRFE) (rm)
04/04/2011DISMISSED
05/09/2011MANDATE ISSUED