judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ADKINS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL V. O STREET MANAGEMENT LLC

Case Information: 11-CV-0201
Short Caption:ADKINS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL V. O STREET MANAGEMENT LLCClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5908-08Filed Date:02/14/2011

Opening Event Date:02/14/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAdkins Limited PartnershipN
Robert L. BellNY
AppellantCilla Adkins N
Robert L. BellNY
AppellantJean Galloway Ball N
Robert L. BellNY
AppellantTodd A. Pilot N
Robert L. BellNY
AppelleeO Street Management LLCN
Paul J. KiernanNY
Michelle T. Hess NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/28/2011APPEARANCE- Paul J. Kiernan & Michelle T. Hess on behalf of aple
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (34-pgs/tape 9/2/10 proc.)w/cd
03/02/2011RECORD INDEX
03/15/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL and NON-APPEALABLE ORDER... (BY: ETW)
03/15/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
04/04/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dated 3/15/11 (Appellants)
05/18/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION as having been taken from a NON-FINAL and NON-APPEALABLE ORDER...SEE HARDCOPY (FITEST)
05/18/2011DISMISSED
06/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED