judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COMET ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company v. POWDER RIVER OIL & GAS VENTURES, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company

Case Heading (S-09-0225)
Case Number:S-09-0225Case Docketed On:11/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Lands (Title 36)
Short Title:COMET ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company v. POWDER RIVER OIL & GAS VENTURES, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company
Full Title:COMET ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, Appellant (Defendant), v. POWDER RIVER OIL & GAS VENTURES, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantComet Energy Services, LLCThomas Reese
AppelleePowder River Oil & Gas Ventures, LLCBlake M. Pickett

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Natural Resources - Oil and Gas
Opinion Number:2010 WY 82
Citation:239 P.3d 382 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/02/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/17/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/18/2009Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
12/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Errata to Appendix 4 of Appellant's Brief: State of Costs of Original TranscriptEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
02/03/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/22/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Blake Pickett for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas F. Reese for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/03/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Deposition and Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/16/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Thomas Reese for appellant; Blake M. Pickett for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/15/2010Record - Other - requested further portions of the record upon court's own motion. Clerk will send today.RecordOtherFinal
04/19/2010Record - Supplemental record on appeal, one volume, original papers and transcript (labeled as Volume IV).RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
04/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingSupplemental record on appeal filedFinal
04/21/2010Record - Supplemental record on appeal, two more additional volumes, Volume V, Original Papers; Volume VI, Transcripts & Exhibits.RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingSupplemental record on appeal filedFinal
06/23/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order Affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/09/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/09/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/13/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/12/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal