judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DALE WAYNE EATON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0220)
Case Number:S-09-0220Case Docketed On:10/30/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:DALE WAYNE EATON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DALE WAYNE EATON, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerDale Wayne EatonDiane M. Lozano
Diane Elizabeth Courselle
RespondentThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2009 WY 144
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/30/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/30/2009Petition - Writ - certiorariPetitionWrit - certiorariFinal
10/30/2009Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
11/12/2009Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
11/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Respondent's Response to Petition for a Writ of Certiorari or Writ of ReviewEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/17/2009Event - Phone Call to counsel for Respondent. Appendix inadvertently left off of Response, request it be e-filed.EventPhone CallFinal
11/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appendix inadvertently left off of pleading.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/24/2009Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
11/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal