judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALFONSO HERRERA DURAZO, a/k/a ALFONSO D. HERRERA, a/k/a ALFONSO DURAZO HERRERA, a/k/a ALFONSO HERRERA v. LORRAINE ANN HERRERA

Case Heading (S-09-0221)
Case Number:S-09-0221Case Docketed On:11/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:ALFONSO HERRERA DURAZO, a/k/a ALFONSO D. HERRERA, a/k/a ALFONSO DURAZO HERRERA, a/k/a ALFONSO HERRERA v. LORRAINE ANN HERRERA
Full Title:ALFONSO HERRERA DURAZO, a/k/a ALFONSO D. HERRERA, a/k/a ALFONSO DURAZO HERRERA, a/k/a ALFONSO HERRERA, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. LORRAINE ANN HERRERA, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAlfonso Herrera DurazoSue Davidson
AppelleeLorraine Ann HerreraMitchell E. Osborn

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/02/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/21/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/22/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/06/2010Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
01/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated Motion to Dismiss ActionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/07/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/07/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal